MS HB314 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 52-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 52-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 33-7-303 And 33-15-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify That The Governor Or Any Other Official Or Employee Of The State May Not Interfere With The Right Of Citizens To Possess Firearms; To Amend Sections 45-9-51 And 45-9-53, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify That Counties And Municipalities May Not Interfere With The Right Of Citizens To Possess Firearms; To Provide A Complaint Procedure To Challenge Ordinances In Violation Of That Right; To Restrict County And Municipal Programs To Purchase Weapons From Citizens; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Weapons; clarify state preemption of local ordinances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-19 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 103 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 40 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 85 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 40 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 85 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-19 | House | Concurred in Amend From Senate |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Amended |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2014-02-13 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2014-02-11 | House | Passed |
2014-02-11 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2014-01-30 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2014-01-16 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |