MS HB3 | 2018 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on August 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-29 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on August 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-29 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-7-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove The Provisions That Decrease The Income Tax Rates For Calendar Years 2019 And Thereafter; To Amend Section 27-7-18, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove The Provisions That Increase The Portion Of The Federal Self-employment Taxes Assessed Against Self-employed Individuals That May Be Allowed As An Adjustment To Gross Income Under The State Income Tax Law In Taxable Years Ending In 2019 And Thereafter; To Amend Sections 27-13-5 And 27-13-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove The Provisions That Decrease The Franchise Tax Rate For Tax Years Beginning On Or After January 1, 2019; To Repeal Section 5, Chapter 499, Laws Of 2016, Which Repeals The Corporation Franchise Law From And After January 1, 2028; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Taxpayer Pay Raise Act; freeze decreases in income and franchise tax rates and freeze increase in federal employment tax deductions.
Sponsors
Rep. David Baria [D] | Rep. Orlando Paden [D] | Rep. Christopher Bell [D] | Rep. Jarvis Dortch [D] |
Rep. Debra Gibbs [D] | Rep. Kathy Sykes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-29 | House | Died In Committee |
2018-08-24 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
Mississippi State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/20181E/pdf/history/HB/HB0003.xml |
Text | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/20181E/html/HB/0001-0099/HB0003IN.htm |