MS HB294 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - Referred To Public Health and Welfare
Pending: Senate Public Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 41-29-137.1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delete The Repealer On The Section That Authorizes Medical Directors Of Hospices To Prescribe Controlled Substances For Patients Of The Hospice For Terminal Disease Pain Without Having An In-person Face-to-face Visit With A Patient Before Issuing A Prescription; To Amend Section 41-29-137, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Provision; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hospices; delete repealer on authority for prescribing certain drugs without in-person visit with a patient.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-16SenateReferred To Public Health and Welfare
2021-02-04HouseTransmitted To Senate
2021-02-03HousePassed
2021-01-26HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-01-18HouseReferred To Public Health and Human Services

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4129137Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback