MS HB273 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 21-23-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That If A Municipal Court Judge Is Accepting A Plea From A Defendant At An Adult Detention Center Of The County, Then The Judge May Hold Court Outside The Boundaries Of The Municipality More Than Within A One-mile Radius Of The Municipality For The Purpose Of Accepting Such Plea; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Municipal judges; authorize to hold court outside municipal boundaries that is more than within a one-mile radius of municipality to accept pleas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-18 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Passed |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-06-01 | Senate | DR - TSDP: MU To JA |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referred To Municipalities;Judiciary, Division A |
2020-03-05 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed |
2020-02-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred To Municipalities |