MS HB1951 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 30 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 30 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Additional Appropriation To The State Department Of Health For The Purpose Of Funding The Arpa Rural Water Associations Infrastructure Grant Program For The Period Beginning Upon The Passage Of This Act And Ending June 30, 2025.
Title
Appropriation; Health, Department of, for funding the ARPA Rural Water Associations Infrastructure Grant Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-30 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-28 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2024-04-28 | House | Immediate Release |
2024-04-28 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2024-04-27 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2024-04-27 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Polk,DeBar |
2024-04-15 | House | Conferees Named Read,Oliver,Cockerham |
2024-04-15 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Amended |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2024-03-27 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-26 | House | Passed |
2024-03-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-03-25 | House | Referred To Appropriations E |