MS HB1948 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Olive Branch, Mississippi, To Acquire, Buy, Sell, Lease, Convey Or Otherwise Dispose Of Sites Within Industrial, Technology, Or Educational Parks; To Finance Or Otherwise Provide Or Receive Funding For Certain Projects And Facilities That Promote Municipal, Community, Technological, Industrial Or Educational Development Within The City Of Olive Branch, Mississippi; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Olive Branch; authorize expenditure of funds to establish industrial, technological or educational park or parks within.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Passed |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2024-04-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-04-10 | House | Passed |
2024-04-04 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-03-25 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |