MS HB1931 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 1, Chapter 940, Local And Private Laws Of 2009, As Last Amended By Chapter 903, Local And Private Laws Of 2020, To Extend The Date Of Repeal From July 1, 2024, To July 1, 2028, On The Provision Of Law That Authorizes The Board Of Supervisors Of Greene County, Mississippi, To Assess A Certain Fee For Any Civil Case Filed And Any Misdemeanor Conviction Obtained In The Justice Court Of The County To Fund Certain Maintenance And Construction Needs Of The Greene County Justice Court Complex; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Greene County; extend repeal date on assessments in justice court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Passed |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2024-04-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-04-10 | House | Passed |
2024-04-04 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-03-21 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |