MS HB1819 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Eupora, Mississippi, To Convey Certain Real Property That Is Located In The City's Industrial Park; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Eupora; authorize conveyance of certain property located within city's industrial park.
Sponsors
Rep. Joey Hood [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 112 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 112 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Passed |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2023-03-24 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2023-03-24 | House | Immediate Release |
2023-03-24 | House | Passed |
2023-03-24 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-03-23 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |