MS HB1817 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2-1)
Status: Failed on April 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-27 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2-1)
Status: Failed on April 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-27 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation For The Purpose Of Paying The Expenses And Providing Contingent Funds For The Legislature, The Expenses Of The Joint Legislative Budget Committee, The Expenses Of The Joint Legislative Committee On Performance Evaluation And Expenditure Review, The Expenses Of The Joint Legislative Reapportionment Committee, The Expenses Of The Joint Committee On Compilation, Revision And Publication Of Legislation, Paying The Monthly Expense Allowance Of The Members Of The Legislature, Paying The State's Share Of Various Assessments, And For Related Purposes, For The Fiscal Year 2025.
Title
Appropriation; Legislative expenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Mims [R] | Rep. John Read [R] | Rep. Manly Barton [R] | Rep. Angela Cockerham [I] |
Rep. John Faulkner [D] | Rep. Joey Hood [R] | Rep. Jay McKnight [R] | Rep. Randal Rushing [R] |
Rep. Percy Watson [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-27 | House | Died In Conference |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Michel,DeBar |
2024-04-15 | House | Conferees Named Mims,Read,Barton |
2024-04-15 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Amended |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2024-03-15 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-14 | House | Passed |
2024-03-13 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-03-13 | House | DR - TSDP: AP To A3 |
2024-03-13 | House | DR - TSDP: A3 To AP |
2024-03-12 | House | Referred To Appropriations D;Appropriations A |