MS HB1815 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2-1)
Status: Failed on April 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-27 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2-1)
Status: Failed on April 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-27 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation For The Purpose Of Paying Salaries And Travel Expenses Of District Attorneys And Assistant District Attorneys Of The State And Paying Office Expenses Of District Attorneys For The Fiscal Year 2025.
Title
Appropriation; District attorneys and staff.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Mims [R] | Rep. John Read [R] | Rep. Manly Barton [R] | Rep. Angela Cockerham [I] |
Rep. John Faulkner [D] | Rep. Joey Hood [R] | Rep. Jay McKnight [R] | Rep. Randal Rushing [R] |
Rep. Percy Watson [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-27 | House | Died In Conference |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Wiggins,Hickman |
2024-04-15 | House | Conferees Named Mims,Read,Cockerham |
2024-04-15 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Amended |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2024-03-15 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-14 | House | Passed |
2024-03-13 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-03-13 | House | DR - TSDP: AP To A3 |
2024-03-13 | House | DR - TSDP: A3 To AP |
2024-03-12 | House | Referred To Appropriations D;Appropriations A |