MS HB1790 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Failed on April 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-27 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Failed on April 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-27 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Approving The Expenditure Of Special Funds For The Purpose Of Defraying The Expenses Of The Tombigbee River Valley Water Management District For The Fiscal Year 2025.
Title
Appropriation; Tombigbee River Valley Water Management District.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Bounds [R] | Rep. John Read [R] | Rep. Brent Anderson [R] | Rep. Bryant Clark [D] |
Rep. Casey Eure [R] | Rep. Jeff Hale [R] | Rep. Lataisha Jackson [D] | Rep. Orlando Paden [D] |
Rep. Bill Pigott [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-27 | House | Died In Conference |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Branning,Jackson |
2024-04-15 | House | Conferees Named Bounds,Read,Arnold |
2024-04-15 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Amended |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2024-03-15 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-14 | House | Passed |
2024-03-13 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-03-13 | House | DR - TSDP: AP To A1 |
2024-03-13 | House | DR - TSDP: A1 To AP |
2024-03-12 | House | Referred To Appropriations B;Appropriations A |