MS HB1786 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Wayne County, Mississippi, To Make Contributions To The Multi-county Community Service Agency, Inc.; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Wayne County; authorize contributions to the Multi-County Community Service Agency, Inc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 110 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 110 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-28 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Passed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-03-26 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2017-03-26 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2017-03-26 | House | Immediate Release |
2017-03-26 | House | Passed |
2017-03-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-03-24 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |