MS HB1786 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Tunica County, Mississippi, To Contribute Funds To The Aaron E. Henry Community Health Services Center, Inc., For The Purpose Of Operating And Maintaining A Community Health Care Facility In Tunica County; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Tunica county; authorize contribution to Aaron Henry Community Health Services Center, Inc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 8 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 8 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-09 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-22 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Passed |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2016-04-15 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2016-04-14 | House | Passed |
2016-04-13 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-04-11 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |