MS HB1777 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The Town Of Blue Mountain, Mississippi, To Expand Its Water And Sewer System Within A Certain Distance Outside The Corporate Limits Of The Town Of Blue Mountain; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Town of Blue Mountain; authorize expansion of water and sewer system for a certain distance outside of town.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-07 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-30 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Passed |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2020-06-19 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-06-18 | House | Passed |
2020-06-17 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-06-12 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |