MS HB1759 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Holmes County, Mississippi, To Provide Certain Compensation To County Patrol Officers; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Holmes County; authorize to provide certain compensation for county patrol officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 118 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-30 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-28 | House | Concurred in Amend From Senate |
2022-03-26 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Amended |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2022-03-18 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-03-18 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-03-18 | House | Passed |
2022-03-17 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-03-16 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |