MS HB1746 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-23 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-23 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 27-25-503 And 27-25-703, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Temporarily Reduce The Rate For The Oil Severance Tax And Gas Severance Tax; To Bring Forward Sections 27-25-505 And 27-25-705, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provide For The Distribution Of Revenue Derived From The Oil Severance Tax And Gas Severance Tax, For The Purposes Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Oil and Gas severance taxes; temporarily reduce rates.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lamar [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Referred To Energy;Finance |
2020-06-03 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-06-02 | House | Passed |
2020-06-02 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-06-02 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-06-02 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |