MS HB1733 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-7-17, Mississippi Code Of 1972, As Amended By House Bill No. 1125, 2023 Regular Session, To Revise The Methods Of Depreciation That May Be Used For Certain Expenditures And Property Under The State Income Tax Law; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Income tax; revise deduction for depreciation for certain expenditures and property.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lamar [R] | Rep. De Stamps [D] | Rep. Chris Brown [R] | Rep. Steve Hopkins [R] |
Rep. Brady Williamson [R] | Rep. Randy Boyd [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 112 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 112 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-16 | House | Concurred in Amend From Senate |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Amended |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2023-02-22 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2023-02-21 | House | Passed |
2023-02-21 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-02-21 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |