MS HB1720 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Warren County, Mississippi, To Contribute Funds To Central Mississippi Prevention Services, Inc.; Triumph Ministries, Inc.; Vicksburg Family Development Services, Inc.; Warren, Washington, Issaquena, Sharkey Community Action Agency, Inc.; Women's Restoration Shelter Of Mountain Faith Ministries; And We Care Communities, Inc.; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Warren County; authorize contributions to various organizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 102 N: 6 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 102 N: 6 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-28 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Passed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2019-03-26 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-03-26 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-03-26 | House | Passed |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2019-03-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |