MS HB1692 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Copiah County, Mississippi, To Provide Labor And Materials To Assist In The Construction Of Roadways For The Campsite For Mississippi's Toughest Kids Foundation; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Copiah County; authorize to provide labor and materials for construction of roadways for campsite for Mississippi's Toughest Kids Foundation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-24 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-03-24 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-03-24 | Senate | Passed |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2018-03-20 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-03-20 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-03-20 | House | Passed |
2018-03-19 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-03-14 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |