MS HB1690 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Approving The Expenditure Of Special Funds For The Purpose Of Defraying The Expenses Of The State Board Of Registration For Professional Engineers And Land Surveyors For Fiscal Year 2021.
Title
Appropriation; Engineers and Land Surveyors, Board of Registration for Professional.
Sponsors
Rep. John Read [R] | Rep. Karl Oliver [R] | Rep. Angela Cockerham [I] | Rep. Jeff Hale [R] |
Rep. Greg Haney [R] | Rep. Mac Huddleston [R] | Rep. Lataisha Jackson [D] | Rep. Timmy Ladner [R] |
Rep. Charles Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-27 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 113 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 113 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-07 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-30 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-27 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2020-06-24 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2020-06-23 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Turner-Ford,Norwood |
2020-06-22 | House | Conferees Named Read,Oliver,Ladner |
2020-06-17 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Amended |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2020-05-27 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-05-27 | House | Immediate Release |
2020-05-27 | House | Passed |
2020-05-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-05-26 | House | Referred To Appropriations |