MS HB1678 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Grenada County, Mississippi, To Establish An Economic And Industrial Development Authority To Be Known As The Greater Grenada Partnership; To Provide For The Appointment Of Trustees Of The Partnership; To Specify The Powers And Duties Of The Partnership; To Allow The Board Of Supervisors To Authorize The Partnership To Provide Certain Economic And/or Industrial Development For The County And The Municipalities Located Therein; To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors To Dissolve The Grenada County Economic Development District; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Grenada County; establish Greater County Partnership as economic and industrial development authority.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Horan [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-07 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-30 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Passed |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2020-06-19 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-06-18 | House | Passed |
2020-06-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-05-26 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |