MS HB1678 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Hinds County, Mississippi, To Contribute Funds To The Morning Star School, A Mississippi Historic Landmark; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hinds County; authorize contribution to Morning Star School, a Mississippi Historic Landmark.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 104 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29 Approved by Governor
2019-03-25SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-25HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-21SenateReturned For Enrolling
2019-03-21SenateImmediate Release
2019-03-21SenatePassed
2019-03-20SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-03-13SenateReferred To Local and Private
2019-03-12HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-03-07HousePassed
2019-03-07HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2019-02-27HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2019-02-18HouseReferred To Local and Private Legislation

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback