MS HB1670 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-151-81, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Classification Of Exceptional Children In Preschool For Reporting And Purposes Of Funding Teacher Units By Removing The Reference To Those Children's Ages Under Maep; And For Related Purposes.
Title
MAEP; clarify classification of exceptional children in preschool for reporting and purposes of funding teacher units.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Referred To Education |
2024-02-29 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-02-28 | House | Passed |
2024-02-22 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-02-19 | House | Referred To Education |