MS HB1639 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-19 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-19 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation For The Purpose Of Defraying The Expenses Of The Office Of State Public Defender Of The State Of Mississippi For The Fiscal Year 2024.
Title
Appropriation; State Public Defender, Office of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 117 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-19 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-04-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-30 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2023-03-29 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 61 | |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2023-03-27 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2023-03-26 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2023-03-26 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2023-03-25 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2023-03-25 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Norwood,McCaughn |
2023-03-15 | House | Conferees Named Read,Cockerham,Boyd (19th) |
2023-03-14 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Amended |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2023-02-16 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2023-02-15 | House | Passed |
2023-02-14 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-02-13 | House | Referred To Appropriations |