MS HB1638 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Provide Procedures For The Mississippi Department Of Revenue To Set Off A Taxpayer's Debt Owed To The Mississippi Department Of Human Services Against The Taxpayer's Income Tax Refund; To Provide A Procedure For The Taxpayer To Request A Hearing Before The Department Of Human Services To Contest The Setoff, And For The Taxpayer To Appeal The Determination Of The Department Of Human Services To The Circuit Court; To Authorize The Department Of Revenue To Provide To The Department Of Human Services All Information Necessary To Accomplish And Effectuate The Intent Of This Act; To Provide For The Continued Confidentiality Of Such Information; To Amend Section 27-7-83, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Income tax; allow DHS to collect debts owed to it through setoff against state income tax refunds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 48 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 101 N: 9 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 48 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 101 N: 9 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-12 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-10 | House | Concurred in Amend From Senate |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Amended |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2024-03-08 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-06 | House | Passed |
2024-03-06 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2024-03-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2024-02-19 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |