MS HB1604 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 27-65-22 And 27-65-101, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Exempt From Sales Taxation Guided Tours, Which Include Providing Accommodations, Guide Services And/or Related Equipment Operated By Or Under The Direction Of The Person Providing The Tour, For The Purposes Of Outdoor Tourism; To Bring Forward Section 27-65-23, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Imposes Sales Tax On Certain Business Activities, For The Purposes Of Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Sales tax; exempt certain guided tour activities.
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Mayo [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 98 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2014-02-27 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2014-02-26 | House | Passed |
2014-02-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-02-25 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |