MS HB1590 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 27-59-3 And 27-59-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Define The Term "diesel Gallon Equivalent" For The Purpose Of The Tax On Liquefied Natural Gas; To Provide That The Tax Levied On Liquefied Natural Gas Shall Be Levied On Each Diesel Gallon Equivalent Of Liquefied Natural Gas; To Amend Section 27-59-29, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Exempt Motor Vehicles That Use Liquefied Natural Gas And No Other Compressed Gas From The Requirement Of Obtaining A Decal From The Department Of Revenue; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Motor fuel tax; levy on each diesel gallon equivalent of liquefied natural gas.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Baker [R] | Rep. Ray Rogers [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-24 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Passed |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2014-02-27 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2014-02-25 | House | Passed |
2014-02-25 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2014-02-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2014-02-24 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |