MS HB1586 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 912, Local And Private Laws Of 2013, As Amended By Chapter 909, Local And Private Laws Of 2014, As Amended By Chapter 918, Local And Private Laws Of 2019, Which Establishes The Coahoma County Reserve And Trust Fund, To Authorize The Coahoma County Board Of Supervisors, Which Is The Trustee Of The Fund, To Utilize A Certain Portion Of The Fund To Pay For And/or Finance The Costs Of Equipping The New Justice Complex/jail Facility/e911 Facility And A Central Fire Station; To Authorize Such Trustees To Utilize An Additional Portion Of The Fund To Pay For And/or Finance The Partial Costs Of Constructing The Jonestown Bypass To Highway 316 And To Pay Costs For Obtaining Certain Real Property For A Certain Project; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Coahoma County; authorize reserve and trust fund to be used to finance jail, fire station, bypass.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-07 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-30 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Passed |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2020-06-19 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-06-18 | House | Passed |
2020-06-18 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-06-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |