MS HB1579 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Jackson County, Mississippi, To Allow The Payment Of Various Taxes, Fees And Other Accounts Receivable That Are Owed To The County By Credit Cards, Debit Cards And Other Forms Of Electronic Payment; To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors To Enter Into Certain Contracts For The Processing And Acceptance Of The Electronic Forms Of Payment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Jackson County; authorize to allow the payment of certain accounts receivable by credit cards and other forms of electronic payment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-07 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-30 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Passed |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2020-06-19 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-06-18 | House | Passed |
2020-06-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |