MS HB1566 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create A New Code Section To Be Codified As Section 69-1-119, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Commissioner Of Agriculture And Commerce To Provide Technical Guidance And Outreach To Landowners, Farmers And Producers Regarding The Management Of Nuisance Wildlife, And To Authorize The Department To Accept And Expend Any Special Funds Received For This Purpose; To Amend Section 69-29-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Number Of Agricultural And Livestock Theft Bureau Investigators And To Authorize The Bureau To Conduct Training For Law Enforcement Related To Laws Enforced By The Bureau And To Assist Other Law Enforcement Agencies In Cases Of Disaster; To Amend Section 25-1-77, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Certain Exemptions Of Department Law Enforcement Vehicles From Bureau Of Fleet Management Requirements; To Amend Section 69-5-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Abolish The State Fair Commission And Transfer Its Functions And Responsibilities To The Department Of Agriculture And Commerce; To Amend Sections 69-5-3, 69-5-5, 69-5-7, 69-5-8, 69-5-11, 69-5-13, 69-5-15, 69-5-27, 69-5-29 And 69-5-31, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; And For Related Purposes.
Title
"Future of Mississippi Agriculture Act of 2020"; enact.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-18 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 113 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 113 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-23 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-18 | House | Concurred in Amend From Senate |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Amended |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-06-09 | Senate | DR - TSDPAA: AC To AG |
2020-06-04 | Senate | DR - TSDPAA: AG To AC |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referred To Agriculture;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2020-03-09 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Passed As Amended |
2020-03-05 | House | Amended |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-03-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-03-03 | House | DR - TSDPCS: WD To AG |
2020-02-25 | House | DR - TSDP: AG To WD |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred To Agriculture;Workforce Development |