MS HB1565 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Starkville, Mississippi, To Levy An Additional Sales Tax Of Not More Than 1% On The Gross Sales Of Hotel And Motels Derived From Room Rentals And Upon The Gross Proceeds Of Sales Of Restaurants For The Purpose Of Providing Funds To Construct, Finance, Operate, Equip, Lease And Maintain New Sports Tournament And Recreational Facilities And Improve Existing Sports And Recreational Facilities; To Provide For An Election On Whether The Tax May Be Levied; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Starkville; authorize levying of additional tourism tax on hotels, motels and restaurants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 100 N: 4 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 100 N: 4 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Passed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-03-20 | Senate | DR - TSDP: LP To FI |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private;Finance |
2019-03-12 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-03-07 | House | Passed |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2019-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2019-01-21 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |