MS HB1550 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Designate A Certain Bridge In Adams County As The "veterans Memorial Bridge"; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Memorial bridge; designate certain bridge in Adams County as "Veterans Memorial Bridge".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation |
2013-02-12 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-02-07 | House | Passed As Amended |
2013-02-07 | House | Amended |
2013-02-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2013-01-21 | House | Referred To Transportation |