MS HB1515 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Law W/out Governor's Signature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Law W/out Governor's Signature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Restore The Right Of Suffrage To Ms. Debra Denise Thomas Of Hinds County, Mississippi; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Suffrage; restore to Debra Denise Thomas of Hinds County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Passed (Y: 100 N: 3 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Passed (Y: 100 N: 3 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Law W/out Governor's Signature | |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-04-01 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Passed |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |
2021-03-23 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-03-23 | House | Immediate Release |
2021-03-23 | House | Passed |
2021-03-18 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |