MS HB1499 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act Making An Appropriation From Special Funds In The State Treasury For The Purpose Of Defraying The Expenses Of The Mississippi Public Service Commission For The Fiscal Year 2015.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriation; Public Service Commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 117 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-16 Approved by Governor
2014-04-01HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2014-04-01SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2014-03-30HouseConference Report Adopted
2014-03-30SenateConference Report Adopted
2014-03-29SenateConference Report Filed
2014-03-29HouseConference Report Filed
2014-03-27SenateConferees Named Clarke,Gollott,Tindell
2014-03-25HouseConferees Named Frierson,Mettetal,Beckett
2014-03-19HouseDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2014-03-17SenateReturned For Concurrence
2014-03-14SenatePassed As Amended
2014-03-14SenateAmended
2014-03-13SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2014-02-26SenateReferred To Appropriations
2014-02-25HouseTransmitted To Senate
2014-02-20HousePassed
2014-02-20HouseAmendment Failed
2014-02-18HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2014-02-17HouseReferred To Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback