MS HB1489 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Enrolled on April 26 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Due From Governor 05/02/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 26 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Due From Governor 05/02/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Be Known As The Mississippi Triage, Treat And Transport To Alternative Destination Act; To Provide That Health Benefit Plans Shall Provide Coverage For An Ambulance Service To Treat Or Assess An Enrollee In Place, Or Triage Or Triage And Transport An Enrollee To An Alterative Destination, Or An Encounter Between An Ambulance Service And Enrollee That Results Without Transport Of The Enrollee Under The Plan; To Provide That The Coverage Required Under This Section Is Subject To The Initiation Of Ambulance Service Treatment As A Result Of A 911 Call That Is Documented In The Records Of The Ambulance Service And Subject To Deductibles Or Co-payment Requirements Of The Plan, And Does Not Diminish Or Limit Benefits Otherwise Allowable Under The Plan; To Provide That The Reimbursement Rate For An Ambulance Service Provider Whose Operators Assess, Triage, Treat Or Transport An Enrollee To An Alternative Destination Shall Be Not Less Than The Minimum Allowable Reimbursement For Advanced Life Support Rate With Mileage To The Scene; To Provide That The Minimum Allowable Reimbursement Rate Under Any Policy Of Accident And Sickness Insurance To An Out-of-network Ambulance Service Provider Shall Be Rates Contracted Between An Ambulance Service Provider And A County, Municipality Or Special Purpose District Or Authority, Or Otherwise Approved Or Established By Ordinance Or Regulation Enacted By Any Such County, Municipality Or Special Purpose District Or Authority; To Provide That In The Absence Of Such Rates, The Minimum Allowable Reimbursement Rate Shall Be The Greater Of Three Hundred Twenty-five Percent Of The Reimbursement Allowed By Medicare For Services Originating In Rural Areas Or The Ambulance Service Provider's Billed Charges; To Provide A Date Of Repeal On Such Provisions; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Ambulance services; provide for payment for treatment in place and provide for minimum reimbursement rate in health insurance policies.
Sponsors
Rep. Stacey Hobgood-Wilkes [R] | Rep. Manly Barton [R] | Rep. William Arnold [R] | Rep. John Hines [D] |
Rep. Carl Mickens [D] | Rep. Lester Carpenter [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Due From Governor 05/02/24 | |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-24 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2024-04-18 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Conferees Named Michel,McLendon,Whaley |
2024-04-16 | House | Conferees Named Turner,Arnold,Carpenter |
2024-04-16 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Amended |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Reconsidered |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Amended |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Insurance |
2024-03-14 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-13 | House | Passed |
2024-03-13 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2024-03-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2024-02-19 | House | Referred To Insurance |