MS HB1477 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 31-7-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Reverse Auctions Shall Not Be Permitted For Procuring Any Labor Or Services, Whether For Design Or Construction, Or For Procuring Any Goods Or Materials That Must Be Fabricated, Constructed Or Installed Through The Use Of Construction Or Design Labor Or Services; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Public purchasing laws; revise certain provisions relating to reverse auctions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2022-02-03 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-02 | House | Passed |
2022-02-01 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |