MS HB1474 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Designate Mississippi Highway 759 In Choctaw County, Mississippi, In The City Of Ackerman As The "james Plemon 'j.p.' Coleman Memorial Highway"; And For Related Purposes.
Title
James Plemon "J.P." Coleman Memorial Highway; designate segment of MS Hwy 759 in City of Ackerman as.
Sponsors
Rep. Joey Hood [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Passed |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation |
2019-02-19 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-02-18 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2019-02-13 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Busby, Massengill) |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed |
2019-02-13 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2019-01-31 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2019-01-21 | House | Referred To Transportation |