MS HB1454 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 49-19-115, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delete The Repeal Date Of June 30, 2020, On The Provision Of Law That Requires The Boards Of Supervisors Of Counties To Levy The Forest Acreage Tax; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Forest acreage tax; delete repeal date on requirement that boards of supervisors levy.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Morgan [R] | Rep. Nick Bain [R] | Rep. John Lamar [R] | Rep. Brad Touchstone [R] |
Rep. Kathy Sykes [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 111 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2017-02-03 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2017-02-02 | House | Passed |
2017-01-31 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-01-16 | House | Referred To Forestry |