MS HB1447 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 29-1-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require All Lands Held By State Agencies To Be Titled In The Name Of The State Of Mississippi, To Authorize Interagency Transfers Of State-held Lands Between State Agencies, To Allow The Secretary Of State, With The Approval Of The Governor, To Accept Donations Of Land To The State, And To Clarify Exemptions From The Application Of This Section; And For Related Purposes.
Title
State-held lands; require lands held by state agencies to be titled in the name of the State of Mississippi.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-03-12 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-11 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-10 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-03-09 | Passed | |
2010-03-01 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-02-15 | Referred To Public Property | |
2010-02-11 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-02-09 | Passed | |
2010-02-09 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2010-02-02 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2010-01-18 | Referred To Public Property |