MS HB1433 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Yalobusha County, Mississippi, To Loan The Oakland Natural Gas District Certain Funds; To Provide That The Loan Shall Be Applied Solely To Existing Indebtedness Of The Gas District; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Yalobusha County; authorize to loan funds to Oakland Yalobusha Natural Gas District to help pay off certain district debt.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 106 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 106 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-05 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Passed |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2021-03-03 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-03-02 | House | Passed As Amended |
2021-03-02 | House | Amended |
2021-03-02 | House | Reconsidered |
2021-02-25 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Barton, Gibbs (36th)) |
2021-02-25 | House | Passed |
2021-02-24 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |