MS HB1423 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Lexington, Mississippi, To Levy A 2% Tax Upon The Gross Proceeds Of Sales Of Restaurants For The Purpose Of Providing Funds To Promote Tourism And Parks And Recreation Within The City; To Require An Election Be Held On The Question Of Whether Such Tax May Be Levied; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Lexington; authorize a tax on restaurants to promote tourism, parks and recreation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 99 N: 4 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 99 N: 4 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Passed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-03-20 | Senate | DR - TSDP: LP To FI |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private;Finance |
2019-03-12 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-03-07 | House | Passed |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2019-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2019-01-21 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |