MS HB1390 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-19 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-19 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-13-171, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delete The Repealer On The Requirement For School Boards To Adopt A Policy On The Implementation Of Abstinence-only Or Abstinence-plus Education Into The Curriculum; To Include Sexual Risk Avoidance Education As An Additional Policy For The Curriculum Requirements; To Make Nonsubstantive Changes To Update Antiquated Language; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Abstinence education; delete repealer on school board requirement to adopt a policy on abstinence-only or abstinence-plus.
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Yancey [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-31 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 46 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 46 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-19 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-04-04 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-31 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2023-03-29 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 61 | |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2023-03-27 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Conferees Named DeBar,Wiggins,Polk |
2023-03-24 | House | Conferees Named Bennett,McLean,Yancey |
2023-03-23 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Amended |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Referred To Education |
2023-02-03 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2023-02-02 | House | Passed |
2023-01-31 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred To Education |