MS HB1387 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Create The "comprehensive Career And Technical Education Reform" Or "ccater" Act; To Provide That Dual Credit Career And Technical Education Instructors Shall Be Required To Have A High School Diploma And Possess A Minimum Of Five Years' Experience But Shall Not Be Required To Hold An Associate Or Bachelor's Degree; To Require The State Board Of Education To Provide Notice To All Incoming Middle School And Junior High Students Of The Career Track Programs Offered By Local School Boards; To Require All Students In The Career And Technical Education Track To Take The Act Workkeys Assessment; To Provide Additional Classes That May Be Added To The Curriculum In The Career Track Program; To Provide That Local Business Or Other Professional Personnel Shall Not Be Required To Hold An Associate Or Bachelor's Degree In Order To Be Granted A One-year Expert Citizen-teacher License; To Provide That The Accreditation System Shall Include Student Performance On The Administration Of The Act Workkeys Assessment, Which Shall Be Weighted In The Same Percentage As The Standard Act Assessment; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mississippi Workforce Incentive Act of 2020; create.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 25 N: 19 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-08 Vetoed
2020-07-02HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-07-02SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-06-30SenateConference Report Adopted
2020-06-30HouseConference Report Adopted
2020-06-29HouseConference Report Filed
2020-06-29SenateConference Report Filed
2020-06-29HouseRecommitted For Further Conf
2020-06-29HouseReconsidered
2020-06-29HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Bell (21st))
2020-06-29SenateRecommitted For Further Conf
2020-06-28HouseConference Report Adopted
2020-06-25SenateConference Report Filed
2020-06-25HouseConference Report Filed
2020-06-22SenateConferees Named Parker,England,Sparks
2020-06-18HouseConferees Named Bell (21st),White,Haney
2020-06-17HouseDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2020-06-12SenateReturned For Concurrence
2020-06-10SenatePassed As Amended
2020-06-10SenateAmended
2020-06-04SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2020-06-03SenateDR - TSDPAA: EC To AP
2020-05-12SenateReferred To Economic and Workforce Development;Appropriations
2020-03-17HouseTransmitted To Senate
2020-03-12HousePassed As Amended
2020-03-12HouseAmended
2020-03-12HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2020-03-11HouseRead the Third Time
2020-03-03HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2020-03-03HouseDR - TSDPCS: AP To WD
2020-02-25HouseDR - TSDP: WD To AP
2020-02-17HouseReferred To Workforce Development;Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/history/HB/HB1387.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/HB/1300-1399/HB1387IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/HB/1300-1399/HB1387CS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/HB/1300-1399/HB1387PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/HB/1300-1399/HB1387SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/ham/HB1387_H_(Cmte_Sub)_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/sam/HB1387_S_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/sam/HB1387_S_Amend_01_to_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/sam/HB1387_S_Amend_02.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/sam/HB1387_S_Amend_02_to_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/house/0660019.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/senate/1560056.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/house/1740014.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/house/1760007.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/senate/1760009.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback