MS HB1386 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Winona, Mississippi, To Contribute Funds To The "donald H. Peterson Memorial Fund"; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

City of Winona; authorize contribution to the "Donald H. Peterson Memorial Fund."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 103 N: 2 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28 Approved by Governor
2019-03-21SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-21HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-20SenateReturned For Enrolling
2019-03-19SenatePassed
2019-03-13SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-02-26SenateReferred To Local and Private
2019-02-08HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-07HousePassed
2019-02-07HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2019-02-06HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2019-01-21HouseReferred To Local and Private Legislation

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback