MS HB1352 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Create The Criminal Justice Reform Act; To Amend Sections 9-23-1, 9-23-3, 9-23-5, 9-23-7, 9-23-9, 9-23-11, 9-23-13, 9-23-15, 9-23-17, 9-23-19, 9-23-21 And 9-23-23, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provide For The Eligibility Of Drug Courts, To Change The Reference Of Drug Courts To "intervention Courts"; To Include Mental Health Courts, Veterans Courts And Other Intervention Courts Under The Authority Of The Intervention Courts Advisory Committee; To Amend Section 9-25-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides For Veterans Courts, To Conform To The Preceding Section; To Amend Sections 9-27-1, 9-27-3, 9-27-7, 9-27-9, 9-27-11, 9-27-15, 9-27-17 And 9-27-19, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provide For The Rivers Mcgraw Mental Health Program, To Conform To The Preceding Sections By Removing The Word "pilot" Throughout; To Repeal Sections 9-27-13 And 9-27-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Regulate Pilot Programs For Mental Health Diversion Courts; To Amend Sections 25-3-35, 43-21-357, 63-11-31.1, 99-3-45 And 99-19-73, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To This Act; To Amend Section 63-1-51, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove The Offense Of Contempt For Failure To Pay A Fine Or Fee Or Failure To Respond To A Summons Or Citation Relating To A Traffic Violation As A Grounds For Revoking A Person's Driver's License; To Amend Section 63-1-53, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That After Certain Notice Is Given To A Person Who Fails To Timely Pay Any Fines, Fees Or Assessments Relating To A Traffic Violation Within 90 Days Of Receiving The Notice, The Person Shall Be Subject To Having The Fines, Fees Or Assessments Collected By A Court Rather Than Having His Or Her Driver's License Suspended; To Amend Section 63-1-52, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Section; To Amend Section 63-1-71, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove The Requirement That A Person's Driver's License Be Suspended For A Controlled Substance Violation That Is Unrelated To Operating A Motor Vehicle; To Amend Section 63-1-46, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Section; To Amend Section 99-19-71, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Eligibility For Expungement; To Amend Section 47-7-49, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Initial Period Allowed For Payment Of The Supervision Fee; To Amend Section 47-7-40, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prohibit Denial Of Earned-discharge Credits Solely On The Basis Of Nonpayment Of Supervision Fees; To Amend Section 99-5-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Release Of Certain Misdemeanants On Recognizance; To Opt Out Of Federal Restrictions On Snap Eligibility For Drug Offenders; To Amend Sections 21-23-7, 43-21-159, 99-15-26 And 99-15-57, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize A Court To Expunge The Record Of A Case In Which The Person Was Found Not Guilty At Trial; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Justice Reform Act; create.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 112 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 111 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16 Approved by Governor
2019-04-02SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-04-02HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-28SenateConference Report Adopted
2019-03-28HouseConference Report Adopted
2019-03-27HouseConference Report Filed
2019-03-27SenateConference Report Filed
2019-03-27SenateConferees Named Hopson,Barnett,DeBar
2019-03-20HouseConferees Named Cockerham,White,Hood
2019-03-18HouseDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2019-03-18SenateReturned For Concurrence
2019-03-13SenatePassed As Amended
2019-03-13SenateAmended
2019-03-05SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2019-02-26SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division A
2019-02-08HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-07HousePassed
2019-02-07HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2019-02-04HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2019-01-21HouseReferred To Judiciary B

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/history/HB/HB1352.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/HB/1300-1399/HB1352IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/HB/1300-1399/HB1352CS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/HB/1300-1399/HB1352PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/HB/1300-1399/HB1352SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/ham/HB1352_H_(Cmte_Sub)_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/sam/HB1352_S_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/sam/HB1352_S_Amend_01_to_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/sam/HB1352_S_Amend_01_to_Subst_1_for_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/sam/HB1352_S_Subst_1_for_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/house/0310048.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/senate/0650012.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/house/0800025.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/senate/0800119.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback