MS HB1347 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-24 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-24 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 23-15-313, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise How Citizens Of A Municipality Are Chosen To Serve On A Temporary Municipal Executive Committee; To Bar Persons Who Have Been Convicted Of A Felony From Serving On A Municipal Executive Committee; To Amend Section 23-15-315, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Section; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Municipal executive committee; revise provisions regarding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-15 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-03-17 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-17 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-15 | Concurred in Amend From Senate | |
2010-03-04 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-03-03 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-03 | Amended | |
2010-02-24 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-02-10 | Referred To Elections | |
2010-02-10 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-02-08 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-02-08 | Amended | |
2010-02-08 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2010-02-04 | Tabled Subject To Call | |
2010-01-26 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2010-01-18 | Referred To Apportionment and Elections |