MS HB1343 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-7-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Procurement Of Aircraft, Aircraft Maintenance, Parts, Equipment And Services By State Institutions Of Higher Learning Which Offer Undergraduate And Graduate Degree Programs In Aviation Shall Be Exempt From The Public Purchase Law Requirements; To Authorize The Department Chair To Establish Purchasing Procedures In Compliance With The Exemption, Which Shall Be Approved By The Ihl Board; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Institutions of higher learning; require to ensure commercially reasonable procurement practices when purchasing aircraft equipment and services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2020-06-03 | Senate | DR - TSDPAA: UC To AC |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referred To Universities and Colleges;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2020-03-06 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Passed |
2020-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-28 | House | DR - TSDP: AC To UC |
2020-02-26 | House | DR - TSDP: UC To AC |
2020-02-24 | House | DR - TSDP: AC To UC |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency;Universities and Colleges |