MS HB1323 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Tallahatchie River Authority To Be Composed Of The Geographic Region Of The Counties That The Tallahatchie River Or Little Tallahatchie River Traverse Or Border In The State Of Mississippi, Subject To The Board Of Supervisors Of A County Voting And Spreading On Its Minutes The Decision To Participate In The Authority; To Provide That Each Participating County Board Of Supervisors May Select One Member Of The Board Of Directors; To Provide Certain Authority To The Tallahatchie River Authority; To Authorize Each Participating County Board Of Supervisors To Contribute Funds To The Authority; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Tallahatchie River Authority; create.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Creekmore [R] | Rep. Thomas Reynolds [D] | Rep. Clay Deweese [R] | Rep. Steve Massengill [R] |
Rep. Jody Steverson [R] | Rep. Tracey Rosebud [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 116 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 113 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 116 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 113 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-28 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-27 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Conferees Named Parker,Sparks,Younger |
2022-03-18 | House | Conferees Named Brown (20th),Clark,Lancaster |
2022-03-15 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Amended |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Reconsidered |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Passed |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Referred To Economic and Workforce Development |
2022-02-14 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-09 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-02-09 | House | Amended |
2022-02-08 | House | Read the Third Time |
2022-01-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred To Conservation and Water Resources |