MS HB1281 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 21-19-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Procedures Provided To Municipalities To Clean Property Determined To Be A Menace To Those In The Municipal Community; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Municipalities; revise procedures that authorize such to clean certain private property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-03-18 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 117 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 111 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-01 Approved by Governor
2010-03-24 Enrolled Bill Signed
2010-03-24 Enrolled Bill Signed
2010-03-18 Concurred in Amend From Senate
2010-03-11 Returned For Concurrence
2010-03-09 Passed As Amended
2010-03-09 Amended
2010-03-09 Reconsidered
2010-03-05 Motion to Reconsider Entered
2010-03-04 Passed As Amended
2010-03-04 Amended
2010-02-24 Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
2010-02-15 Referred To Municipalities
2010-02-11 Transmitted To Senate
2010-02-09 Passed As Amended
2010-02-09 Amended
2010-02-09 Committee Substitute Adopted
2010-02-02 Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2010-01-18 Referred To Municipalities

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback