MS HB1272 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Mississippi Second Amendment Task Force; To Provide For The Members Of The Task Force; To Provide Duties Of The Task Force; To Provide That The Task Force Shall Submit A Report Of Its Findings To The Legislature By December 31, 2015; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Second Amendment Task Force; create.
Sponsors
Rep. Becky Currie [R] | Rep. Tom Miles [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-03 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 92 N: 23 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2015-02-05 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2015-02-03 | House | Passed As Amended |
2015-02-03 | House | Amended |
2015-02-03 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2015-02-02 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2015-01-19 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |